MD HB1239 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an employer, except under certain circumstances, from discriminating against an individual because of the individual's receipt of a certain written certification for the use of medical cannabis or the individual's positive drug test under certain circumstances; establishing that certain provisions prohibiting employment discrimination do not require an employer to allow certain use of medical cannabis or make certain reasonable accommodations; etc.
Title
Discrimination in Employment for Use of Medical Cannabis - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2019-03-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Boundaries
Cannabis
Certifications
Chemical Tests
Discrimination
Federal Government
Health
Human Relations
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Occupational Safety
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Work, Labor and Employment
Cannabis
Certifications
Chemical Tests
Discrimination
Federal Government
Health
Human Relations
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Occupational Safety
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Work, Labor and Employment