MD HB124 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the exemption authorizing a parent or legal guardian of a minor to provide written consent for the minor to use a tanning device; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to make available to each tanning facility a notice to be conspicuously posted in the facility regarding use of the facility by minors, penalties for violations of the Act, and health risks associated with tanning; providing that the Act does not apply to the use of phototherapy devices by certain health care practitioners; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tanning Devices - Use by Minors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {223027/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-29) (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-37) (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 440
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (32-13)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-28SenateFloor Amendment {223027/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-29)
2019-03-27SenateLaid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
2019-03-27SenateFloor Amendment {223027/1 (Senator Ready)
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (100-37)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {846487/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0124&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0124f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0124t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_440_hb0124t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0124_84648701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0124_22302701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0124.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0124_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0435.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0124_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0823.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0947.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback