MD HB124 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to adopt regulations, by October 1, 2021, establishing an occupational safety and health standard protecting employees from exposure to aerosol transmissible diseases; requiring the Secretary of Labor, the Commissioner, and the Maryland Department of Health to develop an Emergency Temporary Occupational Safety and Health Standard to Protect Employees From COVID-19 by March 1, 2021, and to make the information available on the Department of Labor's website; etc.
Title
Occupational Safety and Health Standards to Protect Employees - Aerosol Transmissible Diseases and COVID-19
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-01-18 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-10-14 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
COVID-19
Diseases
Health
Health, Department of
internet
Labor, Department of
Occupational Safety
Personal Protective Equipment
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Safety
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
COVID-19
Diseases
Health
Health, Department of
internet
Labor, Department of
Occupational Safety
Personal Protective Equipment
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Safety
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 5 | 308.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |