MD HB1244 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the name of the Education and Workforce Training Coordinating Council for Correctional Institutions to the Correctional Education Council.
Title
Education and Workforce Training Coordinating Council for Correctional Institutions - Name Change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2015-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2015-03-04 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Education
Job Training
Names
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Correctional Institutions
Education
Job Training
Names
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials