MD HB1244 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, that a diaper-changing facility be installed in certain public restrooms in certain public buildings; requiring the Board of Public Works, through the Department of General Services, to adopt certain standards; providing that the Department of General Services, the University System of Maryland, and the Department of Transportation are responsible for the enforcement of certain provisions of the Act; etc.
Title
Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-14) (Y: 125 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Special Order until next session (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {518074/1 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment {518074/1 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Edwards) Adopted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {518074/1 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-14) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {396883/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
Subjects
Amusement Parks and Carnivals
Construction
Data
Disabilities
Equipment
Forests and Parks
Gender
General Services, Department of
Hotels and Motels
Human Relations
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Mass Transit
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works, Board of
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Universities and Colleges
Toilets
Transportation, Department of
Construction
Data
Disabilities
Equipment
Forests and Parks
Gender
General Services, Department of
Hotels and Motels
Human Relations
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Mass Transit
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works, Board of
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Universities and Colleges
Toilets
Transportation, Department of