MD HB1251 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the matters for which certain employee organizations representing certain Baltimore City police officers or the City of Baltimore may request arbitration; repealing certain provisions limiting the matters that may be arbitrated and prohibiting the board of arbitration from providing for certain issues; requiring the adoption of certain financial terms of employment and certain terms of employment; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Police Department - Collective Bargaining and Arbitration
Sponsors
Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Talmadge Branch [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Keith Haynes [D] |
Sen. Michael Jackson [D] | Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Arbitration
Baltimore City
Collective Bargaining
Counties - Local Laws
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Public Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Unions
Baltimore City
Collective Bargaining
Counties - Local Laws
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Public Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Unions