MD HB1252 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to provide certain boards with a list of certain generally recommended courses relating to the obligation to report child abuse and neglect and the identification of abused and neglected children; and requiring certain boards to post certain information prominently on each board's website, provide information about certain recommended courses to certain health care professionals at a certain time, or advertise the availability of certain recommended courses in certain media.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {812913/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback