MD HB1255 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment and the Department of Transportation to jointly provide technical assistance to certain entities on certain matters; establishing the Zero-Emission Vehicle School Bus Transition Grant Program to provide grants to county boards of education and entities that contract with county board to provide transportation services to purchase zero-emission school buses, install charging infrastructure, and develop plans for transitioning to the use of zero-emission vehicles; etc.
Title
School Bus Transition – Zero–Emission Vehicles – Grant Program and Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-11) (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-37) (Y: 103 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-37) (Y: 103 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-11) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-37) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {855061/2 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) |
2019-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Commerce and Business
Communications
Comptroller
Contracts
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Gifts
Grants
Interest
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Pollution
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
School Buses
State Government - Procurement
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Treasurers
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Commerce and Business
Communications
Comptroller
Contracts
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Gifts
Grants
Interest
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Pollution
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
School Buses
State Government - Procurement
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Treasurers
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous