MD HB1257 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a provision reducing the amount of the subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for military pay dollar for dollar in the amount by which an individual's military pay exceeds $15,000; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2010; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Compensation Outside the

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-09 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-03-07 Re-referred Ways and Means
2011-02-22 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback