MD HB1257 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring specified fiduciary institutions to report suspected financial abuse of an elder adult under specified circumstances; requiring the report to be made to specified individuals and entities at specified times and by specified means; providing that a fiduciary institution is not required to investigate an allegation by an elder adult that financial abuse of the elder adult has occurred or to make a report if the same matter already has been reported; establishing specified civil penalties; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fiduciary Institutions - Protection of Elder Adults from Financial Abuse -

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-02 Approved by the Governor
2012-03-30 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2012-03-27 Second Reading Passed
2012-03-27 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-04-02 Favorable Report by Finance
2012-03-27 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-03-22 First Reading Finance
2012-04-01 Returned Passed
2012-03-21 Third Reading Passed (131-0)
2012-03-19 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-19 Favorable with Amendments 483494/1 Report Adopted
2012-03-22 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2012-02-13 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-10 First Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback