MD HB1257 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying specified provisions of law relating to zoning, planning, subdivision, and other land use laws of the State; altering the contents of a specified annual report to refer to approved rather than adopted plans; requiring specified charter counties on the tidal waters of the State to designate specified areas for specified purposes; clarifying that code counties as well as charter counties shall adopt specified visions and may adopt specified regulations; clarifying a requirement of consistency with the plan; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-1) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-20) (Y: 116 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-16HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674
2013-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2013-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (43-1)
2013-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2013-04-02SenateHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-03-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2013-03-23HouseThird Reading Passed (116-20)
2013-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-22HouseFavorable with Amendments {350019/2 Report Adopted
2013-03-22HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2013-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1257&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb1257f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb1257t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/Chapters_noln/CH_674_hb1257t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1257_35001902.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb1257.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb1257_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb1257_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1257,h-0635&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1257,s-1122&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments

feedback