MD HB1257 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 787
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a lease option agreement to purchase improved residential property, if executed on or after July 1, 2018, to state in capital letters and in close proximity to the tenant's signature that the agreement is an integral part of the lease and is governed by Title 8 of the Real Property Article and a tenant or prospective tenant shall have all applicable rights and remedies provided under that title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Leases - Lease Option Agreements - Required Statements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-12) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 787
2018-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (32-12)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {890318/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-03-06HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback