MD HB1258 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a volunteer of certain fire and rescue entities in Calvert County who dies in the line of duty is eligible for a death benefit of $6,000 under certain circumstances; altering a certain definition; and providing for the retroactive application of the Act.
Title
Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death Benefits (Patricia Ann "Pat" Osburn Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99 |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {509632/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {184061/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |