MD HB1272 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from accepting any federal funding under Title X of the federal Public Health Service Act if the Title X program excludes family planning providers and does not require certain providers to provide a broad range of acceptable and effective medically approved family planning methods and services; requiring the Governor to fund the Family Planning Program with State funds at the same level of total funds as the preceding fiscal year if the Department does not accept Title X program funds; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (28-16) (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-40) (Y: 92 N: 40 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {643620/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-28) (Y: 16 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-38) (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 733
2019-04-04HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (92-40)
2019-04-04HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (28-16)
2019-04-02SenateSpecial Order until next session (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2019-04-02SenateFloor Amendment {643620/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-28)
2019-03-29SenateSpecial Order until 4/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2019-03-28SenateSpecial Order until 3/29 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-27SenateFloor Amendment {573827/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (97-38)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {316082/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1272&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1272f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1272t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1272e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_733_hb1272e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1272_31608201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1272_57382701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1272_64362001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb1272.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1272_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0578.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1272_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0993.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1085.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1333.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback