MD HB1274 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a Class B-Stadium (baseball stadium) beer and light wine license in Charles County to be a Class B-Stadium (baseball stadium) on-sale beer, wine and liquor license; allowing a patron to consume and carry beer and wine anywhere on the premises; allowing a patron to consume liquor only in the enclosed stadium dining area or bar and prohibiting a patron from carrying liquor out of the enclosed stadium dining area or bar; and authorizing the Charles County Board of License Commissioners to adopt specified regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-Stadium (Baseball Stadium)

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-10 Approved by the Governor
2011-04-05 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2011-04-04 Second Reading Passed
2011-04-04 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-04-07 Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-03-30 Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-03-25 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-04-06 Returned Passed
2011-03-22 Third Reading Passed (138-0)
2011-03-21 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-03-21 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2011-03-23 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2011-03-01 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-28 Re-referred Economic Matters
2011-02-24 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback