MD HB1279 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an occupant, a dependent of an occupant, or a prospective tenant who otherwise meets the requirements for tenancy to commence a civil action to obtain relief for a violation of the Maryland Accessibility Code with regard to a building of four or more dwelling units that is subject to the Code; requiring a specified individual to provide written notice to a property manager, landlord, or rental agent before filing a complaint under the Act; etc.
Title
Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - Enforcement
Sponsors
Del. Doyle Niemann [D] | Del. Elizabeth Bobo [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. James Hubbard [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-42) (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (110-25) (Y: 110 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (110-25) (Y: 110 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410 |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-42) |
2013-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2013-04-08 | House | Delegates Niemann, Glenn, and Hogan |
2013-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-08 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2013-04-08 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (31-15) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {164033/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (110-25) |
2013-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {340111/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Apartments
Attorneys' Fees
Building Codes
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Court Costs
Damages
Disabilities
District Courts
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Notices
Public Safety
Attorneys' Fees
Building Codes
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Court Costs
Damages
Disabilities
District Courts
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Notices
Public Safety