MD HB128 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the State song; establishing the State Song Advisory Panel; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Advisory Panel; requiring the Advisory Panel to review certain submissions and suggestions for a new State song and to hold at least three public hearings; requiring the Advisory Panel to report its recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2019; terminating a certain provision of the Act after June 30, 2020; etc.
Title
General Provisions - State Song - Advisory Panel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Hearings
Open Government
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Symbols
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Hearings
Open Government
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Symbols
Sunset