MD HB1281 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Codifying the Bikeways Network Program to provide grant support for bicycle network development activities; requiring the Department of Transportation to establish certain eligibility criteria; requiring the Governor to provide at least $3,800,000 each year from the Transportation Trust Fund for the Program; requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to present a draft transit plan 45 days before finalization to include provisions for reliable transit services to enable certain residents to access certain job opportunities; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation – Bikeways Network Program and Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-33) (Y: 103 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-13) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-33) (Y: 102 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (103-33)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (33-13)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {159335/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-04-02SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-29SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (101-33)
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {714165/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-27HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
2019-02-27HouseHearing canceled (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
2019-02-18HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1281&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1281f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1281t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1281e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/hb1281_71416501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/hb1281_15933501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb1281.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1281_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1281_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0883.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1281_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1325.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1584.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/veto_letters/hb1281.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback