MD HB1284 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting certain insurers, based solely on the status of an applicant or individual status as an organ donor, from taking certain action relating to certain insurance policies; prohibiting certain insurers from prohibiting an applicant or individual from donating an organ as a condition of insurance; providing that certain employees are entitled to up to 60 business days of unpaid organ donation leave in a 12-month period under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Organ Donation - Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {496689/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters |
Subjects
Attorney General
Collective Bargaining
Discrimination
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Labor and Industry, Division of
Leave
Mediation
Medical Treatments
Organ Donorship
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Discrimination
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Labor and Industry, Division of
Leave
Mediation
Medical Treatments
Organ Donorship
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment