MD HB1287 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB643
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Administrator of a certain abandoned property fund to distribute $5,000,000 to a certain Community Development Program Fund; altering the contents of the Community Development Program Fund to include any money distributed from a certain abandoned property fund; and repealing a certain provision providing for the construction of certain Acts of the General Assembly concerning the Community Development Program Act.
Title
Housing - Community Development Program Act - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-40) (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-40) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {320916/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-19 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-18 | House | Reassigned to Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB1287 (Carry Over) 2019-03-20 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Community Development
Economic and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Community Development
Economic and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Revenue and Taxes