MD HB1291 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "health care facility" to exempt from the certificate of need requirements hospitals that are providing certain hospice program services to patients admitted to the hospital.
Title
Health Facilities - Certificate of Need - Exemption for Hospitals Providing Hospice Program Services
Sponsors
Del. Matt Morgan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2020-02-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Certifications
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospices
Hospitals
Medical Treatments
Patients
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospices
Hospitals
Medical Treatments
Patients
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |