MD HB1293 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program in the Department of Health to provide grants to certain fire departments and volunteer fire companies to procure cancer screening tests not generally conducted during routine physical exams for the purpose of reducing cancer mortality among professional and volunteer firefighters; requiring the Governor for certain fiscal years to include at least $100,000 in the annual budget for the Program; etc.
Title
Health - Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program
Sponsors
Del. Carol Krimm [D] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Dan Cox [R] |
Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] | Sen. Mike McKay [R] | Del. Ric Metzgar [R] | Del. Charles Otto [R] |
Del. Jesse Pippy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {766181/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Communications
Counties
Data
Death
Diseases
Evidence
Examinations
Fire Protection
Governor
Grants
Health
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Legislative Services, Department of
Medical Research
Prices
Public Health
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Communications
Counties
Data
Death
Diseases
Evidence
Examinations
Fire Protection
Governor
Grants
Health
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Legislative Services, Department of
Medical Research
Prices
Public Health
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment