MD HB13 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Delegates Atterbeary, Sydnor, and Malone
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Delegates Atterbeary, Sydnor, and Malone
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to file a petition for partial expungement of certain criminal records under certain circumstances; establishing procedures for the filing of a petition for partial expungement; authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of certain records if the person is convicted of a fourth degree burglary; making the Act contingent on a determination that the technical capabilities of the Judicial Information System and Case Search 2.0 are sufficient to comply with the Act and funding for improvements is available; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction
Sponsors
Del. Erek Barron [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-39) (Y: 99 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-39) (Y: 99 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Delegates Atterbeary, Sydnor, and Malone |
2019-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-08 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2019-04-08 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {218474/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-39) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {802013/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-11-16 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Burglary
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Government
Expungement
Hearings
Jurisdiction
Petitions
Records
Reports
State's Attorneys
Statutes of Limitation
Burglary
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Government
Expungement
Hearings
Jurisdiction
Petitions
Records
Reports
State's Attorneys
Statutes of Limitation