MD HB13 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB716
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-21 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-21 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from knowingly and intentionally releasing or causing to be released, or organizing the release of, a certain balloon into the atmosphere; authorizing the Department to delegate certain enforcement authority to a certain unit, officer, or official of a local government; requiring a certain unit, officer, or official of a local government with delegated enforcement authority to report certain violations to the Department; establishing a maximum civil penalty of $250 for a violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-47) |
2020-02-20 | House | Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Anderton) Adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {670010/1 Adopted |
2020-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-09 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-09-17 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB13 (Carry Over) 2020-02-21 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB28 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-12 - Referred Environment and Transportation
SB28 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-12 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Age
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fines
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Litter
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Radio
Refuse Disposal
Age
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fines
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Litter
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Radio
Refuse Disposal
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 2301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |