MD HB13 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a unit of State, county, or municipal government from knowingly using public funds to influence the decisions of county or municipal employees to support or oppose an employee organization that represents or seeks to represent the employees, or to become a member of an employee organization; etc.
Title
Influence on Collective Bargaining - Prohibition on Use of Public Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737 |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-41) |
2021-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {314663/1 Adopted |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means |
2020-09-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Collective Bargaining
Counties
Income Tax
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Unions
Work, Labor, and Employment
Counties
Income Tax
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Unions
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 1 | 1314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 2 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |