MD HB1301 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the distribution of certain sales and use tax revenue; altering the definition of "vendor", under the sales and use tax, to include certain marketplace facilitators and marketplace sellers; requiring a marketplace facilitator to collect the sales and use tax on certain sales to a buyer in the State; providing that a marketplace facilitator is not liable for a failure to collect certain sales and use taxes except under certain circumstances; requiring certain out-of-state sellers to pay the tobacco tax on certain items; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation of Online Sales – Marketplace Facilitators and Sellers of Other Tobacco Products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-7) (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (104-31) (Y: 104 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-33) (Y: 105 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (104-31)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (39-7)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {959830/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-04-08SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2019-04-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (105-33)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {885665/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-27HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-22HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1301&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1301f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1301t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1301e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_735_hb1301e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/hb1301_88566501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/hb1301_95983001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb1301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1301_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1234.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1301_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1615.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1443.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback