MD HB1305 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, rather than authorizing, a register of wills to waive certain fees for the administration of an estate if certain real property subject to administration in this State is to be transferred to a certain individual or is encumbered by a lien and subject to sale under certain provisions of law, and the estate is unable to pay the fees by reason of poverty; and applying the Act prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees - Required

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-3) (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (42-3)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-11HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback