MD HB1306 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a nonprofit entity shall be deemed controlled by the Howard County Housing Commission if the nonprofit entity is established by the Commission under certain provisions of law and the Commission has the power to appoint a majority of the board of directors of the nonprofit entity or is the sole member of the nonprofit entity; and altering the applicability of certain tax exemption provisions to include a subsidiary entity of a certain Howard County Housing Commission entity under certain circumstances.
Title
Howard County - Howard County Housing Commission - Subsidiary Entities Ho. Co. 26-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-1) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-1) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-02 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-1) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-13 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Economic and Community Development
Exemptions
Housing
Howard County
Nonprofit Organizations
Property Tax
Counties - Local Laws
Economic and Community Development
Exemptions
Housing
Howard County
Nonprofit Organizations
Property Tax