MD HB1312 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Department of the Environment from issuing certain discharge permits to a person for a new industrial poultry operation or for the purpose of extending or expanding an industrial poultry operation in operation on or before September 30, 2020.
Title
Water Pollution Control - Discharge Permits - Industrial Poultry Operations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB841 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Agriculture
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Flood Control
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Pollution
Time
Water
Weights and Measures
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Flood Control
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Pollution
Time
Water
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 323 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 323.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |