MD HB132 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the eligibility requirements for the Robotics Grant Program to include certain nonprofit organizations providing certain youth with an out-of-school time experience that focuses on personal and workforce development, to support existing robotics programs and to increase the number of robotics programs in the State; and requiring the Governor to increase the annual appropriation for the Program to at least $350,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Robotics Grant Program - Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {395265/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback