MD HB1320 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a court to prohibit a person convicted of a third or subsequent offense of driving under the influence of alcohol from operating a motor vehicle that is not equipped with an ignition interlock system and to order the person to install an ignition interlock system on the person's vehicle as a sentence, part of a sentence, or condition of probation; requiring a court to order certain motor vehicles to be impounded or immobilized for a certain period under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsors
Del. Barrie Ciliberti [R] | Del. Lauren Arikan [R] | Del. Dan Cox [R] | Del. Wayne Hartman [R] |
Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Michael Malone [R] | Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
Del. Sid Saab [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2020-02-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Abandoned Vehicles
Agents and Brokers
Alcoholic Beverages
Bonds
Communications
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Drivers' Licenses
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Evidence
Fees
Identification
Law Enforcement
Liens
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Prices
Records
Repeat Offenders
Safety
Storage
Towing
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Agents and Brokers
Alcoholic Beverages
Bonds
Communications
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Drivers' Licenses
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Evidence
Fees
Identification
Law Enforcement
Liens
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Prices
Records
Repeat Offenders
Safety
Storage
Towing
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 16 | 404.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 902.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 902.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |