MD HB1327 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the minimum required appropriation to the Small Business Development Center Network Fund at the University of Maryland, College Park Campus beginning with an appropriation of $1,500,000 in fiscal year 2021 and increasing to $3,000,000 for fiscal year 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business Development Center Network Fund - Minimum Appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-02-28HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-22HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback