MD HB133 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to provide for the renovation of the Ocean City Convention facility; increasing, from $17,340,000 to $21,700,000, the amount the Board of Public Works may approve for the issuance of certain bonds related to the Ocean City Convention facility without receiving authorization by the General Assembly; altering certain contribution amounts, allocations of savings, and leasehold ownership allocations that must be contained in a certain lease or other written agreement with Ocean City; etc.
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-3) (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-3) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Bonds
Capital Budgets
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
General Assembly
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Ocean City
Public Works, Board of
Stadium Authority
Stadiums
Bonds
Capital Budgets
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
General Assembly
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Ocean City
Public Works, Board of
Stadium Authority
Stadiums