MD HB133 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the authorization for the Governor, with the approval of the Board of Public Works, to reduce a certain appropriation by not more than 25% of the legislative appropriation as approved by the General Assembly for any eight-digit program in the State operating budget in any fiscal year; and increasing to 7 the number of calendar days the Board must wait before approving a proposed reduction of an appropriation after the Secretary of Budget and Management publishes and provides certain notice of the proposed reduction.
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
Sponsors
Del. Marc Korman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 29 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2021-04-02 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-29) |
2021-04-02 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {779338/1 Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-31) |
2021-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {854264/1 Adopted |
2021-02-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-01-04 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2020-09-16 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB30 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Disclosure
Governor
Notices
Open Government
Operating Budget
Public Works, Board of
Publications
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Disclosure
Governor
Notices
Open Government
Operating Budget
Public Works, Board of
Publications
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 7 | 213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |