MD HB1339 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipality to provide, by law, the minimum number of years, not to exceed 40 years, that an elderly individual must live in the same dwelling in order to be eligible for a certain statewide optional property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.
Title
Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals - Eligibility
Sponsors
Del. Michele Guyton [D] | Del. Harry Bhandari [D] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Dan Cox [R] |
Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Ric Metzgar [R] | Del. Stephanie Smith [D] | Del. Julian Ivey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {765862/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2019-02-18 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counties
Elderly Persons
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Residency
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Counties
Elderly Persons
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Residency
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property