MD HB134 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, beginning January 1, 2020, a restaurant from providing a single-use plastic straw to a customer dining in at the restaurant unless the customer requests a straw; and providing the Act does not apply to restaurant services provided at a drive-through window.
Title
Environment - Single-Use Plastic Straws - Use in Restaurants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2019-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2019-01-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Communications
Environment
Environmental Matters
Recycling
Restaurants
Communications
Environment
Environmental Matters
Recycling
Restaurants