MD HB1346 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defining "rent", for premises subject to a residential lease, means the fixed periodic sum for use and possession of the leased premises and does not include any additional payments due from the tenant to the landlord under the lease.
Title
Residential Leases - Definition of "Rent"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2017-03-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |