MD HB135 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a court to order a defendant convicted of a charge of animal cruelty under the Act, as a condition of sentencing, to participate in and pay for psychological counseling and to pay, in addition to any other fines and costs, all reasonable costs incurred in removing, housing, treating, or euthanizing an animal confiscated from the defendant; etc.
Title
Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {252315/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | House | Reassigned to Judiciary |
2019-01-21 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Abuse
Animals
Bonds
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Fines
Forfeiture
Hearings
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Prices
Search and Seizure
Animals
Bonds
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Fines
Forfeiture
Hearings
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Prices
Search and Seizure