MD HB1352 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Approving certain projects for the acquisition, development, and improvement of certain academic facilities for the University System of Maryland; approving the issuance of bonds by the University System of Maryland in a certain total principal amount for financing the projects; and providing that the bonds issued under the authority of the Act are not a debt or obligation of the State or any of its subdivisions.
Title
University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-28 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-22 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-18 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |