MD HB1364 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the authority of a person that exists and functions for a legal business in Prince George's County to apply for the appointment of special police officers to protect business property; and prohibiting the renewal of a commission of a special police officer employed by a legal business in Prince George's County to protect business property.
Title
Prince George's County - Special Police - Legal Business Prohibition PG 308-19
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2019-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-13 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |