MD HB1366 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a public school student to complete, as part of a specified curricula, instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation that includes hands-only cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of an automated external defibrillator beginning with students entering Grade 9 in the 2015-2016 school year; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Automated External Defibrillator Instruction (Breanna's Law)
Sponsors
Del. Jon Cardin [D] | Del. Carolyn Howard [D] | Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] | Del. Susan Aumann [R] |
Del. Barbara Frush [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176 |
2014-04-04 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {404437/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {235268/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-24 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-21 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Emergency Medical Services
Equipment
Health
Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Students
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Emergency Medical Services
Equipment
Health
Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Students