MD HB1368 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a law enforcement agency and State or local volunteer fire company, rescue squad, fire department, and ambulance service to place a move over safety monitoring system on an emergency vehicle for the purpose of recording a motor vehicle committing a violation relating to the operation of a motor vehicle on approach of an emergency vehicle; requiring a recorded image made by a move over safety monitoring system to include certain images and information; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization
Sponsors
Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2019-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-22 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-18 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Ambulances
Citations
Civil Actions
Clerks of Court
District Courts
Evidence
Fire Protection
Forms
Identification
Judges
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Liability
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Postal Service
Radar
Recordings
Reports
Rescue Squads
Revenue and Taxes
Trials
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Volunteers
Citations
Civil Actions
Clerks of Court
District Courts
Evidence
Fire Protection
Forms
Identification
Judges
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Liability
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Postal Service
Radar
Recordings
Reports
Rescue Squads
Revenue and Taxes
Trials
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Volunteers