MD HB137 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a nonairport taxicab operator from soliciting commercial passengers at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport; requiring a nonairport taxicab operator to immediately depart the Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport terminal after dropping off a commercial passenger; authorizing a certain taxicab operator to park in a public parking lot at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport; establishing a civil penalty of up to $500 for violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWI
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-3) (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-3) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-02-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {363191/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-01-25 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Airports
Boundaries
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Fines
Licenses
Parking
Solicitation
Taxicabs
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Boundaries
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Fines
Licenses
Parking
Solicitation
Taxicabs
Transportation
Transportation - Generally