MD HB137 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that teachers employed by the Maryland School for the Deaf are in the professional service in the State Personnel Management System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed 47-0 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 538
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-02-14HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-02-12HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-12HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-11HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-01-22HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback