MD HB1370 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $1,100,000,000 to $1,130,000,000 the cap on the maximum amount of bonds the Maryland Stadium Authority is authorized to issue to finance improvements to Baltimore City public school facilities; requiring a supplemental memorandum of understanding to be entered into before the issuance of additional bonds to finance improvements to a Baltimore City public school facility; requiring certain State lottery revenues to be deposited into the Baltimore City Public School Construction Financing Fund; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Public School Construction - Bonds and Supplemental Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-22 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Bonds
Capital Budget
Comptroller
Construction
Education - Miscellaneous
Lottery
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Revenue and Taxes
Bonds
Capital Budget
Comptroller
Construction
Education - Miscellaneous
Lottery
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Revenue and Taxes