MD HB1373 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1197
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Baltimore County Board of Education to employ legal counsel and a Chief Budget Analyst; providing for the terms of employment and salary of the legal counsel and Chief Budget Analyst; requiring the legal counsel to serve as the legal advisor to the County Board; requiring the Chief Budget Analyst to review the County Board's budget and approve or return the budget with suggested changes; requiring the Chief Budget Analyst to ensure that education spending is in accordance with the County Board's budget; etc.
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Legal Counsel and Chief Budget Analyst
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Boteler [R] | Del. Robin Grammer [R] | Del. Carl Jackson [D] | Del. Bob Long [R] |
Del. Nino Mangione [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2020-03-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1373 (Carry Over) 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Subjects
Attorneys
Baltimore County
Budgets
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Legal Aid
Salaries and Compensation
Baltimore County
Budgets
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Legal Aid
Salaries and Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 4 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 104.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1373?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1373f.pdf |