MD HB1379 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting certain individuals who are members of the Employees' Pension System of the State Retirement and Pension System from becoming a member of the Optional Retirement Program of the State Retirement and Pension System on or after February 1, 2015.
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Membership
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-28 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-28 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-22 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Forms
General Assembly
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
State Universities and Colleges
Time
Transportation, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment
Communications
Forms
General Assembly
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
State Universities and Colleges
Time
Transportation, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment