MD HB138 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that, on or before February 1 each year, the Department of State Police submit a report on the acquisition of equipment by law enforcement agencies through federal surplus programs within the preceding calendar year to the Governor and the General Assembly; and requiring the Department to include in a prominent location on its public website a link to the Defense Logistics Agency's report listing excess Department of Defense property transfers to law enforcement agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law Enforcement – Federal Military Surplus Program – Equipment Acquisition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-1) (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-04HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (139-1)
2019-04-04HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {158777/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-25SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (140-1)
2019-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {722612/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-22HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0138&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0138f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0138t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0138e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0138_72261201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0138_15877701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0138.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0138_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0134.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0138_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1048.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1271.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback