MD HB1383 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county board of education to include certain questions regarding a student's history of brain injury or neurologic insult on a certain form; requiring certain questions to be developed by the State Department of Education in consultation with the State Traumatic Brain Injury Advisory Board; requiring public schools to report certain information to the county board or county health department each year; requiring each county board to report certain information to the Maryland Department of Health each year; etc.
Title
Education - Students With Traumatic Brain Injury - Reports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Education, Boards of
Emergencies
Examinations
Forms
Health
Health, Department of
Injury
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Special Education
Students
Counties
Education, Boards of
Emergencies
Examinations
Forms
Health
Health, Department of
Injury
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Special Education
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 4 | 138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 8 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1383?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1383f.pdf |