MD HB1388 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain carriers to provide each insured under a policy or contract of long-term care insurance in the State an annual notice, in writing or electronically, containing the insured's policy form number and the carrier's customer service telephone number.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Long-Term Care Insurance - Annual Notice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-04-04SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-04-02SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-27HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-27HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-26HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-02-22HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback